EP1449544 - Metallic implants having roughened surfaces and methods for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | [2009/52] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Depuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wen, Hai Bo 847 Lydia Drive Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | 02 /
Li, Panjian 11108 Bitter Dell Ct. Fort Wayne, IN 46814 / US | 03 /
Smith, Todd 14510 Lightning Ridge Road Fort Wayne, IN 46814 / US | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250999.2 | 24.02.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | US20030373390 | 24.02.2003 Original published format: US 373390 | US20040770157 | 02.02.2004 Original published format: US 770157 | [2009/50] |
Former [2004/35] | US20030373390 | 24.02.2003 | |
US20040700157 | 02.02.2004 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449544 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1449544 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/04, A61L27/56, C23F1/02 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
A61F2/30767 (EP);
A61L27/04 (EP);
A61L27/50 (EP);
C23F1/26 (EP);
A61F2/3094 (EP);
A61F2002/30769 (EP);
A61F2002/30925 (EP);
A61F2310/00017 (EP);
A61F2310/00023 (EP);
A61F2310/00029 (EP);
A61F2310/00131 (EP);
A61F2310/00407 (EP);
A61F2310/00598 (EP);
A61F2310/00796 (EP);
A61F2310/00928 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | Metallimplantate mit einer aufgerauhten Oberfläche und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2004/35] | English: | Metallic implants having roughened surfaces and methods for producing the same | [2004/35] | French: | Implants métalliques à surfaces rugueuses et procédés de production | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2009 | 19.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.2010 | BE | 14.04.2010 | CY | 14.04.2010 | CZ | 14.04.2010 | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | FI | 14.04.2010 | HU | 14.04.2010 | NL | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CY | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 14.04.2010 | |
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 14.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3855638 (PILLIAR R) [Y] 16-23 * column 2, line 39 - line 67 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 43 * * figure 1 * * claim - *; | [Y]US5456723 (STEINEMANN SAMUEL G [CH], et al) [Y] 16-19 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 14 * * claim - *; | [Y]US5843289 (LEE DOSUK D [US], et al) [Y] 16-23 * column 2, line 42 - line 45 * * column 3, line 57 - line 65 * * column 5, line 28 - line 42 * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 27 * * example 3 * * claim - *; | [A]WO0166479 (ITAELAE ARI [FI], et al) [A] 1-36 * page 7, line 13 - line 27 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 3 ** claim - *; | [X]WO03008657 (SMITH & NEWPHEW INC [US], et al) [X] 16-20,22,23 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0050] * * claim - * | by applicant | US5236459 | US5307594 | US20030373390 |