EP1460126 - Microorganisms sampling method and microorganism sampling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIBUYA KOGYO CO., LTD Koh 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | [2009/25] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states SHIBUYA KOGYO CO., LTD Koh 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Shigeru Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Hisashi Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | 03 /
Yoneda, Kenji Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | 04 /
Oshima, Yasusuke Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | 05 /
Kokubo, Mamoru Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | 06 /
Akers, James E. 1215 West 60th Terrace Kansas City Missouri 64113 / US | [2009/23] |
Former [2009/05] | 01 /
Yoshida, Shigeru Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | ||
02 /
Yamamoto, Hisashi Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | |||
03 /
Yoneda, Kenji-Koh Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | |||
04 /
Oshima, Yasusuke Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | |||
05 /
Kokubo, Mamoru-Koh Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | |||
06 /
Akers, James E. 1215 West 60th Terrace Kansas City Missouri 64113 / US | |||
Former [2004/39] | 01 /
Yoshida, Shigeru Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | ||
02 /
Yamamoto, Hisashi Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | |||
03 /
Yoneda, Kenji-Koh Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | |||
04 /
Oshima, Yasusuke Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | |||
05 /
Kokubo, Mamoru-Koh Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | |||
06 /
Akers, James E. 1215 West 60th Terrace Kansas City Misouri 64113 / US | Representative(s) | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251501.5 | 17.03.2004 | [2004/39] | Priority number, date | JP20030078529 | 20.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003078529 | JP20030125884 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003125884 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1460126 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1460126 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1460126 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/26, B25J19/06, G01N1/22, C12Q1/22 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
B25J21/005 (EP,US);
A61L2/20 (EP,US);
A61L2/24 (EP,US);
A61L2/28 (EP,US);
B08B15/023 (EP);
B25J21/02 (EP,US);
C12M33/04 (EP,US);
C12M37/00 (EP,US);
G01N1/2202 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/39] | C12M1/26, B25J19/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2007/16] |
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entnahme von Mikroorganismen und Vorrichtung zur Entnahme von Mikroorganismen | [2004/39] | English: | Microorganisms sampling method and microorganism sampling device | [2004/39] | French: | Méthode de prélèvement de microorganismes et dispositif de prélèvement de microorganismes | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2000283910 ; | [DA]JP2000219216 ; | [PA]WO03085126 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [PA] 1-15* figures 1,2; claims 1-24 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000283910 A 20001013 (DAIWA CAN CO LTD) [DA] 1-15 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000219216 A 20000808 (DAIWA CAN CO LTD) [DA] 1-15 * abstract * |