EP1460364 - Automotive heat exchangers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei UK Limited Llethri Road Llanelli Carmarthenshire SA14 8HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei UK Limited Llethri Road Llanelli, Carmarthenshire SA14 8HU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yuan, Youming c/o Calsonic Kansei UK Limited, Llethri Road Llanelli, Carmarthenshire SA14 8HU / GB | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2004/39] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 0AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251603.9 | 19.03.2004 | [2004/39] | Priority number, date | GB20030006271 | 19.03.2003 Original published format: GB 0306271 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1460364 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1460364 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/047, F28F1/02, F28F9/26 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
F28D1/05375 (EP);
F28D1/0476 (EP);
F28F1/022 (EP);
F28F1/128 (EP);
F28D2021/0073 (EP);
F28F2270/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/32] |
Former [2012/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2012/22] | |||
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2004/39] | English: | Automotive heat exchangers | [2004/39] | French: | Echangeurs de chaleur pour véhicule automobile | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 16.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LU, IT, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 15.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04187991 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP) [X] 1-5,7-9* abstract *; | [X]US5314013 (TANABE KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1-9,12-15 * column 2, line 5 - column 5, line 22; figure - *; | [X]EP0654645 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 34 - column 9, line 24 *; | [X]FR2793013 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [X] 1-12,16 * abstract * * page 5, line 26 - page 8, line 38 *; | [X]EP1070929 (VALEO KLIMATECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-12,16 * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] , [0019] - [0058]; figure - *; | [E]EP1448945 (MODINE MFG CO [US]) [E] 1-5,7-14,16 * page 4, line 25 - page 13, line 18; figure - *; | [E]EP1452814 (ZEXEL VALEO CLIMATE CONTR CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,6,9-12,16 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1459028 (MODINE MFG CO [US]) [E] 1,4,5,7-12,16 * page 5, line 20 - page 12, line 17; figure - * | Examination | JPS58108394 | EP0367078 | EP0431917 | JP2001248995 | JP2002181488 |