EP1467096 - Pump and fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arthur, Alan R. 7100 Classic Way South Salem, OR 97306 / US | 02 /
Watts, Gary J. 4732 Caribou Drive SW Albany, OR 97321 / US | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251627.8 | 22.03.2004 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | US20030410620 | 07.04.2003 Original published format: US 410620 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1467096 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1467096 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04B9/00, F03G7/06, B25J9/10 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
F03G7/065 (EP,US);
F04B43/026 (EP,US);
F04B9/00 (EP,US);
F05C2251/08 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/48] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pumpe und Brennstoffzelle | [2004/42] | English: | Pump and fuel cell | [2004/42] | French: | Pompe et pile à combustible | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/11] | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/12] | 01.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 13.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.10.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.10.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09259912 ; | [X]FR2663085 (DEBRUILLE MARC) [X] 1 * the whole document * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5575790 (CHEN MICHAEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XY]WO02057627 (M2 MEDICAL AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9-11,13 * the whole document * * paragraph [0057] * [Y] 15,16,18-21 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09259912 A 19971003 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 15,16,18-21 * abstract * |