EP1489321 - Motor control system, motor apparatus, vacuum pump, correction current value measuring apparatus, and motor control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOC Edwards Japan Limited Shuwa Shiba Park Building A-3F 4-1, Shibakoen 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states BOC Edwards Japan Limited Shuwa Shiba Park Building A-3F 4-1, Shibakoen 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohtachi, Yoshinobu, c/o BOC Edwards Japan Ltd. 3-1, Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Namiki, Hitotaka, c/o BOC Edwards Japan Ltd. 3-1, Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Maejima, Yasushi, c/o BOC Edwards Japan Ltd. 3-1, Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba / JP | 04 /
Fukami, Hideo, c/o BOC Edwards Japan Ltd. 3-1, Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba / JP | 05 /
Kawashima, Toshiaki, c/o BOC Edwards Japan Ltd. 3-1, Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba / JP | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251754.0 | 25.03.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | JP20030116437 | 22.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003116437 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1489321 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16C39/06, H02K7/09, H02P6/10 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
H02P6/10 (EP,US);
F16C2360/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/37] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Kontrolle des Motors, Motor, Vakuumpumpe, Vorrichtung zur Messung eines Korrekturstroms, und Verfahren zur Kontrolle des Motors | [2004/52] | English: | Motor control system, motor apparatus, vacuum pump, correction current value measuring apparatus, and motor control method | [2004/52] | French: | Système de contrôle du moteur, moteur, pompe à vide, appareil de mesure d'un courant de correction et procédé pour contrôler le moteur | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4455514 (OHNO HIROTOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 22 * * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 21 *; | [A]EP0920109 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 9-11 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 41 *; | [A]WO0120751 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 6,10* page 6, line 24 - page 8, line 19 *; | [XA]US6236130 (AMRHEIN WOLFGANG [AT], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11 * abstract * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 17 * * column 6, line 48 - column 8, line 7 * * column 12, lines 45-49 * * column 13, lines 12-16 * * claims 1,4,6,8,9,12 * [A] 6,10; | [A]EP1189335 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [A] 8-11 * page 32, line 57 - page 36, line 12 *; | [A]WO02067407 (KIM DAE-GON [KR]) [A] 1-7,11 * page 6, line 17 - page 11, line 12 * |