EP1462687 - A lip seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAMES WALKER & COMPANY LIMITED Lion House Oriental Road Woking Surrey GU22 8AP / GB | [2006/20] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states JAMES WALKER & COMPANY LIMITED Woking Business Centre, Hoe Bridge, Old Woking Surrey GU22 8JL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Armour, James Edward Gordon 29 Alexandra Gardens Knaphill Woking Surrey GU21 2DG / GB | 02 /
Hankin, Alon Dutton House 114 High Brigham Brigham Cockermouth Cumbria CA14 0TJ / GB | 03 /
Elliott, Godfrey Duncan 10 Whitemore Road Guildford Surrey GU1 1QT / GB | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251771.4 | 26.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | GB20030006963 | 26.03.2003 Original published format: GB 0306963 | GB20030025507 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: GB 0325507 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462687 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462687 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
F16J15/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Lippendichtung | [2004/40] | English: | A lip seal | [2004/40] | French: | Joint à lèvres | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 20.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.06.2006 | CY | 07.06.2006 | CZ | 07.06.2006 | EE | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | PL | 07.06.2006 | RO | 07.06.2006 | SI | 07.06.2006 | SK | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | BG | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | ES | 18.09.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | HU | 08.12.2006 | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/44] | BE | 07.06.2006 | |
CY | 07.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
HU | 08.12.2006 | ||
Former [2009/40] | BE | 07.06.2006 | |
CY | 07.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | BE | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | BE | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | BE | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | BE | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
PL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1111002 (LAMORT E & M) [A] 1-3,7,11,13,14,17-19 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 25 ** figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE2643769 (HOWALDTSWERKE DEUTSCHE WERFT) [X] 1,3,7-9,11,13-19 * page 5, paragraphs 2-4 * * figures 1-3 * |