EP1462509 - Lubricating oil compositions and methods for improving fuel economy in an internal combustion engine using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Texaco Development Corporation 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiel, Yvonne C. 60 Seminary Hill Road Carmel, New York 10512 / US | 02 /
Leisenring, Roger L. 19 Monaco Drive Hopewell Junction, New York 12533 / US | 03 /
Hayden, Thomas E. 25 Bowdoin Lane Wappingers Falls, New York 12590 / US | 04 /
Kohl, Kevin M. 23 Day Lily Place The Woodlands, Texas 77381 / US | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2004/40] | Nash, David Allan HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251795.3 | 26.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | US20030402170 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: US 402170 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1462509 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1462509 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04, C10M159/12 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
C10M169/042 (EP,US);
C10M159/12 (EP,US);
C10M2207/022 (EP,US);
C10M2207/126 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2207/40 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/082 (EP,US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/54 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/11] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schmiermittelzusammensetzungen und Methoden zur Verbesserung der Kraftstoffeinsparung in einem Verbrennungsmotor | [2004/40] | English: | Lubricating oil compositions and methods for improving fuel economy in an internal combustion engine using same | [2004/40] | French: | Compositions d'huiles lubrifiantes et méthode pour améliorer les économies de carburant dans un moteur à combustion interne | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/14] | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 03.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4439336 (ZAWESKI EDWARD F [US]) [A] 1-50 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 60; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0335702 (ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES INC [US]) [X] 1-40 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 57 * * page 6, line 9 - line 35 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]US4889647 (ROWAN EUGENE V [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [X]US4921624 (KAMMANN JR KARL P [US]) [X] 1-40 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 23 * * example -; claim - *; | [A]US5942475 (SCHLOSBERG RICHARD H [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * column 2, line 5 - line 25 * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 35 - line 43 * * column 6, line 15 - column 8, line 38 * * tables 10-14 *; | [A]US2003009930 (DEROSA THOMAS F [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * column W *; | [A] - COCKBILL, B.; BENNETT, J., "The Effects of Crankcase Oil Viscosity on Engine Friction at Low Temperatures", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, (20020622), no. 2000-01-2052, XP002326183 [A] 1-40 |