EP1464265 - Vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOOVER LIMITED Dragonparc, Abercanaid Merthyr Tydfil Mid Glamorgan CF48 1PQ / GB | [2009/46] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states HOOVER LIMITED Dragonparc, Abercanaid Merthyr Tydfil, Mid Glamorgan CF48 1PQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Macleod, Euan Skinner 3/1 12 Naburn Gate Glasgow G5 06Q / GB | 02 /
Henderson, Christopher Richard 2/R 30 Falkland Street, Hyndland Glasgow G12 9QY / GB | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 0AA / GB | ||
Former [2004/41] | Evans, Huw David Duncan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 OAA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251834.0 | 29.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | GB20030007929 | 05.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0307929 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1464265 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1464265 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464265 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/16 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
A47L9/1666 (EP,US);
A47L9/20 (EP,US);
Y10S55/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Title | German: | Staubsauger | [2004/41] | English: | Vacuum cleaner | [2004/41] | French: | Aspirateur | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.11.2009 | BE | 11.11.2009 | CY | 11.11.2009 | CZ | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | EE | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | NL | 11.11.2009 | PL | 11.11.2009 | RO | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | SI | 11.11.2009 | SK | 11.11.2009 | TR | 11.11.2009 | BG | 11.02.2010 | GR | 12.02.2010 | PT | 11.03.2010 | IE | 29.03.2010 | LU | 29.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
NL | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 29.03.2010 | ||
LU | 29.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 29.03.2010 | ||
LU | 29.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 29.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 29.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
IE | 29.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2003061878 ; | [A]US2002108208 (HAMADA ATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0026] , [0029] , [0030] *; | [Y]WO02078506 (POLAR LIGHT LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 2,10 * page 1, line 8 - line 9 * * page 1, line 22 - line 28 * * page 2, line 15 - line 24 * * page 6, line 1 - line 13 *; | [Y]US2002194695 (STEPHENS PAUL D [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0028] *; | [XP]US2003182757 (SEPKE ARNOLD L [US]) [XP] 1,3-6,8-10* paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0025] , [0028] *; | [XP]US2003221277 (OH JANG-KEUN [KR], et al) [XP] 1-5,7,8 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0045] - [0047] * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030703), vol. 2003, no. 07, & JP2003061878 A 20030304 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5,8 * abstract * [Y] 2,6,10 | by applicant | WO0228260 | JP2003061878 |