EP1469111 - A circular knitting machine equipped with a knitting timing switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precision Fukuhara Works, Ltd. 1-5, Honjo-cho 1-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe Hyogo 658-0012 / JP | [2009/27] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Precision Fukuhara Works, Ltd. 1-5, Honjo-cho 1-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe, Hyogo 658-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onishi, Yasushi 1-508-302, Gakuen-nishimachi 5-chome Nishi-ku, Kobe, Hyogo 651-2103 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Hiroyuki 6-7-404, Ibukidai-nishimachi 1-chome Nishi-ku, Kobe, Hyogo 651-2243 / JP | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252069.2 | 07.04.2004 | [2004/43] | Priority number, date | JP20030112517 | 17.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003112517 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1469111 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1469111 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D04B9/06, D04B15/32 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
D04B9/065 (EP);
B65B61/02 (KR);
B65B11/52 (KR);
D04B15/322 (EP);
D04B9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Title | German: | Rundstrickmaschine mit einer Umschaltvorrichtung für das Kulieren | [2004/43] | English: | A circular knitting machine equipped with a knitting timing switching device | [2004/43] | French: | Métier à tricoter circulaire avec un dispositif d'alternation du moment de cueillage | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 23.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.07.2009 | BE | 01.07.2009 | CY | 01.07.2009 | CZ | 01.07.2009 | DK | 01.07.2009 | EE | 01.07.2009 | FI | 01.07.2009 | NL | 01.07.2009 | PL | 01.07.2009 | RO | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | SI | 01.07.2009 | SK | 01.07.2009 | TR | 01.07.2009 | BG | 01.10.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | HU | 02.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CY | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CY | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | SI | 01.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1079169 (WILDT MELLOR BROMLEY LTD)[A] 1-4 |