EP1468841 - Envelope transport and insertion machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bell and Howell, LLC 3791 S. Alston Avenue Durham, NC 27713 / US | [2011/46] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Böwe Bell + Howell Company 3791 South Alston Avenue Durham, NC 27713 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heilman, Robin L. 143 Lakeside Circle Willow Springs, NC 27592 / US | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2011/46] | Lampe, Sigmar, et al Marks&Clerk (Luxembourg) LLP B.P. 1775 1017 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2005/39] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2004/43] | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott, Will & Emery, 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252146.8 | 13.04.2004 | [2004/43] | Priority number, date | US20030462319P | 14.04.2003 Original published format: US 462319 P | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1468841 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1468841 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1468841 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B43M3/04 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
B43M3/04 (EP,US);
B65H5/085 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [2008/44] |
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kuvertier- und Transportmaschine für Umschläge | [2004/43] | English: | Envelope transport and insertion machine | [2004/43] | French: | Machine pour le transport et l'insertion d'enveloppes | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 21.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11195594.4 / EP2433811 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2257961 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-18* page 10, line 17 - page 11, line 2; figure 3 * | by applicant | US5178379 |