EP1479937 - An engine exhaust damping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arvin International (UK) Limited Exhaust Systems Division, Warton Technical Centre, Hillock Lane Preston, PR4 1TR / GB | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burge, Neil 10 Lindsay Avenue Lythem, St.Annes, FY8 3LN / GB | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2004/48] | Croston, David, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252148.4 | 13.04.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | GB20030011386 | 17.05.2003 Original published format: GB 0311386 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1479937 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1479937 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/10 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
F01N13/08 (EP);
F01N13/008 (EP);
F16F7/1005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/02] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Eine Motorabgasdämpfungsvorrichtung | [2004/48] | English: | An engine exhaust damping device | [2004/48] | French: | Dispositif d'amortissement de gaz d'échappement de moteurs | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/27] | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.11.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.11.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60173306 ; | [A]GB1278330 (SULZER AG [CH]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [DX]GB2228778 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [DX] 1-7 * figure - *; | [A]US5213184 (LEGOUIS THIERRY [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US5713438 (ROSSETTI DINO J [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US5802184 (HEATH MICHAEL C [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [X]US5883447 (CLAUSIN JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1-9,14-16 * figures 7A,10-13 *; | [X]EP0945643 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,14-16 * paragraphs [0044] , [0062] , [0070]; figure 7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860116), vol. 0100, no. 10, Database accession no. (M - 446), & JP60173306 A 19850906 (MAZDA KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | GB2228778 |