|
04.02.2010 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.10.2009 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2009 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
14 |
|
31.07.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.01.2008 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2004 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2004 |
Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |