EP1591275 - Transfer method and adhesive for transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sugino, Nobuo 7th Floor, 2-5-10 Takashima, Nishi-ku Yokohama Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Sugino, Nobuo 7th Floor, 2-5-10 Takashima, Nishi-ku Yokohama Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252466.0 | 28.04.2004 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1591275 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/17 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
B44C1/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] |
Former [2006/27] | |||
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Übertragungsverfahren und Klebstoff zur Übertragung | [2005/44] | English: | Transfer method and adhesive for transfer | [2005/44] | French: | Procédé de transfert et adhésif pour le transfert | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/39] | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.06.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | 19.06.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.06.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   19.06.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3922435 (ASNES BENJAMIN) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US4548857 (GALANTE RICHARD J [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US4935300 (PARKER TIM [US], et al) [X] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]US5766731 (STEIN SAMUEL H [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * |