EP1473555 - Engine vibration monitoring using accelerometers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mollmann, Daniel E. 11212 Gosling Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45252 / US | 02 /
Merwe, Gert ven der 50 Meadowlands Drive Monroe, Ohio 45050 / US | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2004/45] | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252535.2 | 30.04.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | US20030426185 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: US 426185 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1473555 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1473555 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/28, G01M15/00 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
G01M1/28 (EP,US);
G01D3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/16] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schwingungsüberwachung eines Motors mittels Beschleunigungsaufnehmer | [2004/45] | English: | Engine vibration monitoring using accelerometers | [2004/45] | French: | Surveillance des vibrations d'un moteur utilisant des accéléromètres | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 01.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 09.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4213114 (COCHARD MICHEL [CH]) [A] 1* column 1, line 47 - line 58 *; | [Y]US4939654 (KOUDA MASANORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 13 - line 20 *; | [A]US5060560 (VANDEMARK LOWELL [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0577159 (BOEING CO [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 6, line 14 - line 35; figures 1,3 * |