EP1473964 - Microphone array, method to process signals from this microphone array and speech recognition method and system using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kong, Dong-geon D2-408 Bohoon Apt. Banyeo 3-dong Haeundae-gu Busan / KR | 02 /
Choi, Chang-kyu 62-1 Gugi-dong Jongno-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Bang, Seok-won D105-1008 Saemter-maeul 718 Ilwon-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Bon-Young No. 103-605 Hanyang Apt. Kwonseon-dong Kwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/45] | 01 /
Kong, Dong-geon #2-408 Bohoon Apt. Banyeo 3-dong Haeundae-gu Busan / KR | ||
02 /
Choi, Chang-kyu 62-1 Gugi-dong Jongno-gu Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Bang, Seok-won #105-1008 Saemter-maeul 718 Ilwon-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
Lee, Bon-Young No. 103-605 Hanyang Apt. Kwonseon-dong Kwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252563.4 | 30.04.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | KR20030028340 | 02.05.2003 Original published format: KR 2003028340 | KR20040013029 | 26.02.2004 Original published format: KR 2004013029 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1473964 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1473964 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/40, H04R3/00, H04R3/04, G10L21/02 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
G10L21/0208 (EP,US);
H04R1/406 (EP,US);
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
G10L2021/02166 (EP,US);
H04R2201/401 (EP,US);
H04R2201/403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/16] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrofonvorrichtung, Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Signalen von dieser Mikrofonvorrichtung und dieses benutzendes Spracherkennungsverfahren und Spracherkennungssystem | [2009/16] | English: | Microphone array, method to process signals from this microphone array and speech recognition method and system using the same | [2004/45] | French: | Réseau de microphones, méthode de traitement des signaux de ce réseau de microphones et méthode et système de reconnaissance de la parole en faisant usage | [2004/45] |
Former [2004/45] | Mikrofonvorrichtung, Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Signalen von dieser Mikrofonvorrichtung und dieses benutzende Spracherkennungsverfahren und Spracherkennungssystem | Examination procedure | 31.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 10.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5539859 (ROBBE FRAN OIS [FR], et al) [Y] 20,21,23,24 * column 1, line 5 - column 6, line 3 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 3 * [A] 1-19; | [A]US6049607 (MARASH JOSEPH [IL], et al) [A] 22,25* column 4, line 65 - column 10, line 2 *; | [A]US6289309 (DEVRIES ALBERT [NL]) [A] 22,25 * column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 47 * * column 5, line 21 - column 9, line 40 *; | [XAY] - ASANO, F; HAYAMIZU, S; YAMADA, T; NAKAMURA, S., "Speech Enhancement Based on the Subspace Method", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, (200009), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 497 - 507, XP011054034 [X] 20,21,23,24 * page 497 - page 505 * [A] 1-19 [Y] 20,21,23,24 | [A] - MCCOWAN I A ET AL, "Adaptive parameter compensation for robust hands-free speech recognition using a dual beamforming microphone array", INTELLIGENT MULTIMEDIA, VIDEO AND SPEECH PROCESSING, 2001. PROCEEDINGS OF 2001 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON 2-4 MAY 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010502), ISBN 962-85766-2-3, pages 547 - 550, XP010544783 [A] 1-21,23,24 * page 547 - page 550 * | [A] - FARRELL K ET AL, "Beamforming microphone arrays for speech enhancement", DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING 2, ESTIMATION, VLSI. SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 23, (19920323), VOL. 5 CONF. 17, ISBN 0-7803-0532-9, pages 285 - 288, XP010058659 [A] 1-21,23,24 * page 285 - page 288 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1992.225915 |