EP1475029 - Surface cleaning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grey Technology Limited Lodge Gate, Church Lane Whittington Worcester WR5 2RQ / GB | [2011/01] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Grey Technology Limited Lodge Gate, Church Lane Whittington, Worcester WR5 2RQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states Grey Technology Limited Lodge Gate, Church Lane Whittington, Worcester WR 2RQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grey, Niocholas Gerald 7 Laxton Close Crowle Worcestershire WR7 4BH / GB | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Gee, Steven William D.W. & S.W. GEE 1 South Lynn Gardens London Road Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Gee, Steven William 1 South Lynn Gardens, London Road Shipston on Stour Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB | ||
Former [2004/46] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcester WR3 7RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252575.8 | 01.05.2004 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | US20030431783 | 08.05.2003 Original published format: US 431783 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1475029 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1475029 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1475029 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/32, A47L11/33, A47L13/00 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
A47L11/4075 (EP,US);
A47L11/32 (EP,US);
A47L11/33 (EP,US);
A47L11/40 (EP,US);
A47L11/4025 (EP,US);
A47L11/4041 (EP,US);
A47L11/4069 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | Reinigungsvorrichtung für eine Fläche | [2004/46] | English: | Surface cleaning apparatus | [2004/46] | French: | Appareil de nettoyage pour une surface | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2011 | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | DK | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | FI | 05.01.2011 | HU | 05.01.2011 | PL | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SE | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | SK | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | GR | 06.04.2011 | IE | 01.05.2011 | LU | 01.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 01.05.2011 | ||
LU | 01.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 01.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | PL | 05.01.2011 | |
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | SI | 05.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0910147 ; | [A]US1995513 (MARCKRES CHARLES D) [A] * page 1, lines 104-109; figure 4 *; | [X]US5101534 (WATANABE SYUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 9, paragraph 2 - column 9, paragraph 4; figures 6,8,9 *; | [A]EP0649625 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] * column 12, lines 55-58; figure 8 *; | [A]GB2304550 (WATTS KEITH MEREDITH [GB]) [A] * page 5, paragraph 4 *; | [X]GB2351435 (BISSELL INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 19, lines 18,19; figure 17 *; | [X]US6421875 (COOMBS RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, lines 58-62 * * column 7, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]US6434786 (ROBERTS TERRANCE M [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, lines 27-54; figures 3,3a,3b * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09010147 A 19970114 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |