EP1593685 - Peptide antioxidants from soy protein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS, INC. Three Lakes Drive Northfield Illinois 60093 / US | [2008/28] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS, INC. Three Lakes Drive Northfield Illinois 60093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gao, Song 224 Hidden Valley Drive Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US | 02 /
Miller, Miranda 801 North Patton Arlington Heights, Illinois 60004 / US | 03 /
Han, Xiao Quing 1329 Stonegate Road Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252588.1 | 04.05.2004 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1593685 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1593685 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/08, C07K5/10, C07K7/06, C12P21/06, A23J3/34, A23J3/16, A61K38/06, A61K38/07, A61K38/08, A61K38/01 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP);
A23J1/14 (EP);
A23J3/16 (EP);
A23J3/34 (EP);
C07K5/1008 (EP);
C07K5/1024 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Title | German: | Peptid-Antioxidantien aus Sojaproteinen | [2005/45] | English: | Peptide antioxidants from soy protein | [2005/45] | French: | Antioxidants peptidiques provenant de protéines de soja | [2005/45] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2008 | BE | 09.07.2008 | CY | 09.07.2008 | CZ | 09.07.2008 | DK | 09.07.2008 | EE | 09.07.2008 | FI | 09.07.2008 | NL | 09.07.2008 | PL | 09.07.2008 | RO | 09.07.2008 | SI | 09.07.2008 | SK | 09.07.2008 | TR | 09.07.2008 | BG | 09.10.2008 | SE | 09.10.2008 | PT | 09.12.2008 | HU | 10.01.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/43] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CY | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
TR | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
HU | 10.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
HU | 10.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 09.07.2008 | |
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | JP48014942B B4 00000000 [ ] (RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CENTER, JAPAN DEFENSE AGENCY); | [A]EP0657520 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 8-10,20-22 * claim 3; sequences 10-21 * * page 7, line 30 - line 38 *; | [X]WO03097791 (AGRICULTURAL RES ORG [IL], et al) [X] 11,16 * page 41, line 30; sequence 32 *; | [X] - SONNET, PASCAL ET AL, "First synthesis of segetalins B and G: two cyclopentapeptides with estrogen-like activity", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS , 44(16), 3293-3296 CODEN: TELEAY; ISSN: 0040-4039, (2003), XP004417090 [X] 1,2,11-13 * Scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(03)00583-5 | [X] - SAITO KOICHIRO ET AL, "Antioxidative properties of tripeptide libraries prepared by the combinatorial chemistry.", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20030604), vol. 51, no. 12, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 3668 - 3674, XP002298641 [X] 11 * abstract * * page 3674, column L, line 1 - line 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf021191n | [A] - HERRAIZ TOMAS ET AL, "Endogenous and dietary indoles: A class of antioxidants and radical scavengers in the ABTS assay.", FREE RADICAL RESEARCH, (200403), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 1071-5762, pages 323 - 331, XP009037286 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 327, column R, line 6 - line 9 * * page 328, column L, line 18 - line 24 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10611860310001648167 | [A] - HIYOSHI, AKIRA ET AL, "Preventing oxidation of oils and fats of food", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19840512), Database accession no. 1974:46644, URL: STN, XP002298503 [A] 9,21 * abstract * | [DX] - CHEN H-M ET AL, "STRUCTURAL ANALYSIS OF ANTIOXIDATIVE PEPTIDES FROM SOYBEAN BETA-CONGLYCININ", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1995), vol. 43, no. 3, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 574 - 578, XP001027076 [DX] 23 * abstract * * page 574, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00051a004 | [A] - CANDELARIO-MARTINEZ A ET AL, "SCP-related peptides from bivalve mollusks: Identification, tissue distribution, and actions", BIOLOGICAL BULLETIN (WOODS HOLE), (1993), vol. 185, no. 3, ISSN 0006-3185, pages 428 - 439, XP002298642 [A] 23 * abstract * |