EP1477537 - Ink-jet recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/47] | Ink-jet ink set and recording method using the same | ||
[2007/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta Medical & Graphic, Inc. 1 Sakura-machi, Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | [2008/09] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Konica Minolta Medical & Graphic Inc. 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Tokyo 163-0512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Atsushi Konica Minolta Med. & Graphic, Inc. 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Stuttard, Garry Philip, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Stuttard, Garry Philip, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2004/47] | Eddowes, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252641.8 | 06.05.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | JP20030135688 | 14.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003135688 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1477537 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1477537 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/10, C09D11/00 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
B41M7/0081 (EP,US);
C09D11/40 (EP,US);
B41M5/0023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/31] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldruckverfahre | [2007/48] | English: | Ink-jet recording method | [2007/48] | French: | Méthode d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [2007/48] |
Former [2004/47] | Tintenstrahldruckfarbenset und Aufzeichnungsverfahren hiermit | ||
Former [2004/47] | Ink-jet ink set and recording method using the same | ||
Former [2004/47] | Assortiment d'encres pour imprimantes à jet d'encre et méthode d'enregistrement l'utilisant | Examination procedure | 21.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 15.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05018667.5 / EP1630213 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4551736 (SUZUKI EIICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9929787 (XAAR TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [X] 2,4,8,10,12* table 1 *; | [A]US6114406 (CAIGER NIGEL ANTONY [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1302499 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [PX]EP1321497 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [PX] 1-12 * paragraph [0099]; example 4; claim - * |