EP1482159 - Engine nozzle and engine with such a nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Webster, John Richard 396 Burton Road Derby DE23 6AF / GB | 02 /
Jones, Alan Richard 270 Broadway Derby DE22 1BN / GB | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc Patents Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252682.2 | 07.05.2004 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | GB20030012505 | 31.05.2003 Original published format: GB 0312505 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1482159 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1482159 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/10, B64D33/02, F02C7/042 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
B64D33/04 (EP,US);
F02C7/042 (EP,US);
F02K1/10 (EP,US);
F05D2300/50212 (EP,US);
F05D2300/505 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/49] | F02K1/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/42] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schubdüse und Triebwerk mit solcher Schubdüse | [2004/49] | English: | Engine nozzle and engine with such a nozzle | [2004/49] | French: | Tuyère et moteur avec une telle tuyère | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/23] | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/20] | 21.12.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 31.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/23] | 31.12.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/20] | Request for further processing for: | 03.10.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 03.10.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3074232 (ROBERT SOYER) [X] 1,6,8-11,15 * figure - *; | [X]US3119581 (WILLIAM TREVASKIS HENRY) [X] 1,6,8-11,15 * figure - *; | [X]US3285003 (ERHARD MARTIN ERWIN HERBERT, et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-11,15 * column 3, line 35 - line 37 *; | [X]US3611724 (KUTNEY JOHN T) [X] 1,6,8-11,15 * figure - *; | [X]US5226455 (DUPONT ANTHONY A [US]) [X] 1,2,6,12-15* figure - *; | [X]US5725709 (JENSEN DUANE LOWELL [US]) [X] 1,5,6,15 * figure - *; | [XY]US6089505 (GRUENSFELDER CYNTHIA ANN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10,11,15 * figure - * [Y] 5; | [Y]EP1090835 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0007]; figures 5-7 *; | [X] - PITT D M ET AL, "SAMPSON SMART INLET DESIGN OVERVIEW AND WIND TUNNEL TEST PART I-DESIGN OVERVIEW", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (20020318), vol. 4698, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 13 - 23, XP008019302 [X] 1,3-5,10,11,15 * page 15 - page 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.475064 | Examination | US2546293 | US2593420 | GB675624 | US2608820 | GB680453 | GB739105 | US3007304 | GB984925 | GB1116542 | US3615052 | GB1418665 | DE3103860 | GB2374121 | US2003070417 |