EP1486153 - Bread-making kitchen appliance and blade arrangement therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENWOOD MARKS LIMITED New Lane Havant Hampshire PO9 2NH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Kenwood Marks Limited New Lane Havant, Hampshire PO9 2NH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clark, Simon Kenwood Marks Limited New Lane Havant Hampshire P09 2NH / GB | 02 /
Mosley, Stephen Kenwood Marks Limited New Lane Havant Hampshire P09 2NH / GB | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey, et al QED Intellectual Property Limited Parchment House 13 Northburgh Street London EC1V 9JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey, et al QED Intellectual Property Limited Harrow Exchange 2 Gayton Road Harrow Middlesex HA1 2XU / GB | ||
Former [2004/51] | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey QED I.P. Services Limited, Dawley Road Hayes, Middlesex, UB3 1HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04253396.8 | 08.06.2004 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | GB20030013284 | 10.06.2003 Original published format: GB 0313284 | GB20040004468 | 01.03.2004 Original published format: GB 0404468 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486153 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/07, A21B7/00, A21C1/02, A21C1/14, B01F15/00 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
A21B7/005 (EP);
A21C1/02 (EP);
A21C1/1405 (EP);
A47J43/0722 (EP);
B01F27/0543 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Title | German: | Brotbackmaschine und Rühreranordnung dafür | [2004/51] | English: | Bread-making kitchen appliance and blade arrangement therefor | [2004/51] | French: | Machine de fabrication de pain et arrangement d'un bras mélangeur associé | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0894436 (SHAM JOHN CHUN KUEN [HK], et al) [A] 1,8,10* column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 22; figures 3,4 *; | [XY]DE29911750U (SOFTGRAPH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-13 * page 2 - page 3; figure - * [Y] 9; | [DXY]AU756226B (BREVILLE R & D PTY LTD) [DX] 1,2,4,5,10,11 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 29; figure - * [Y] 9 |