EP1486117 - Reel unit and cover member for a spinning reel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Myojo, Seiji Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2009/51] |
Former [2004/51] | 01 /
Myojo, Seiji Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Representative(s) | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/51] | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company, Scotland House, 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04253479.2 | 10.06.2004 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | JP20030168745 | 13.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003168745 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1486117 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1486117 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486117 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01K89/01 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
A01K89/01 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Title | German: | Haube für eine Angelrolle | [2004/51] | English: | Reel unit and cover member for a spinning reel | [2004/51] | French: | Couvercle pour un moulinet de pêche | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.2010 | BE | 19.05.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | CZ | 19.05.2010 | DK | 19.05.2010 | EE | 19.05.2010 | FI | 19.05.2010 | IT | 19.05.2010 | NL | 19.05.2010 | PL | 19.05.2010 | RO | 19.05.2010 | SE | 19.05.2010 | SI | 19.05.2010 | SK | 19.05.2010 | TR | 19.05.2010 | IE | 10.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | BG | 19.08.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | ES | 30.08.2010 | PT | 20.09.2010 | HU | 20.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
TR | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 10.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 10.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
HU | 20.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 10.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 10.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 10.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
BE | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
IT | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
DK | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
NL | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
PL | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
SI | 19.05.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
ES | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | ES | 30.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH09313079 ; | [X]US2863617 (CHAPIN HOWARD R, et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US4402469 (STINER ROY E [US]) [X] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4524923 (TUNODA KIKUO [JP], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]FR2740003 (MITCHELL SPORTS [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 6 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09313079 A 19971209 (SHIMANO INC) [DA] 1 * abstract * |