EP1489240 - Backflow seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Farrell, Donal F. Pride Cottage, Lower End Salford Chipping Norton OX7 5YP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Farrell, Donal F. Pride Cottage, Lower End Salford, Chipping Norton OX7 5YP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Gee, Steven William D.W. & S.W. GEE 1 South Lynn Gardens London Road Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Gee, Steven William D.W. & S.W. GEE, 1 South Lynn Gardens, London Road Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 04253558.3 | 15.06.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | GB20030013795 | 16.06.2003 Original published format: GB 0313795 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1489240 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1489240 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E03D11/00 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
E03D11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rückflussdichtung | [2004/52] | English: | Backflow seal | [2004/52] | French: | Joint de retour de fluide | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/28] | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2529587 (BATES HARRY U, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4112527 (GIUBILO LAURO B) [A] 1* the whole document * |