EP1489313 - Threaded fastener particularly suited for plastics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LeVey, Kenneth R. 943 Wild Ginger Trail West Chicago Illinois 60185 / US | 02 /
Bechtel, Frank W. Jr. 8151 Harvest Hill Drive Roscoe Illinois 61073 / US | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2004/52] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04253641.7 | 17.06.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | US20030600195 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: US 600195 | US20040768287 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: US 768287 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1489313 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1489313 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16B39/30, F16B33/02, F16B25/00 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
F16B33/02 (EP,US);
F16B39/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/37] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schraube besonders geeignet für Kunststoffe | [2004/52] | English: | Threaded fastener particularly suited for plastics | [2004/52] | French: | Vis en particulier pour matières plastiques | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4576534 (BARTH GERALD D [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5044853 (DICKE ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9* figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19848717 (REISSER SCHRAUBENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002081171 (WERNER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0023] * * claims 6,8 * * figure 1 * |