EP1516826 - Secure life jacket container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BE AEROSPACE, INC. 1400 Corporate Center Way Wellington, FL 33414 / US | [2005/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hough, Ray Badger View Cottage, 35-37 Water End Road Mauden, Bedfordshire MK45 2BD / GB | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY, West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 04253797.7 | 25.06.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | US20030666199 | 18.09.2003 Original published format: US 666199 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516826 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516826 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/20, B63C9/22, B64D25/04 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
B64D11/0629 (EP,US);
B63C9/22 (EP,US);
B64D11/0631 (EP,US);
B64D25/04 (EP,US);
B65D77/2032 (EP,US);
B65D2401/00 (EP,US);
Y10S206/807 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/12] | B65D77/20, B65D101/00, B63C9/22, B64D25/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/50] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Manipulationsgeschützter Behälter für Rettungsweste | [2005/12] | English: | Secure life jacket container | [2005/12] | French: | Conteneur de sécurité pour gilet de sauvetage | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 24.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3623683 (BENNETT WILLIAM B) [A] 10,20* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [YA]EP0422847 (MAYER OSKAR FOODS [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 34 * * column 8, line 19 - line 46; figures 2,12 * [A] 10,20; | [Y]US6127023 (MARBLER CLAUDE A [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * column 3, line 5 - line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]WO03024794 (RECARO AIRCRAFT SEATING GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 10,20 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 6; figure 3 * |