EP1498985 - Antenna device and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otaka, Naoki, NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | 02 /
Aoyama, Shigeya NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | 03 /
Sugimoto, Noriyasu NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254217.5 | 14.07.2004 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | JP20030196496 | 14.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003196496 | JP20040179987 | 17.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004179987 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498985 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498985 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/04, H01Q1/38, H01Q1/36 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
H01Q9/40 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2005/40] |
Former [2005/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antennenvorrichtung und Methode zur Herstellung dieser Vorrichtung | [2005/03] | English: | Antenna device and method for manufacturing the same | [2005/03] | French: | Dispositif antenne et son procédé de production | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0634808 (BALL CORP [US]) [A] 1-26 * column 5, line 24 - column 7, line 26 * * figures 1,5,9 *; | [Y]EP0762533 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [Y] 2,3,6,10,12-15,17,20,21,23 * abstract * * page 3, lines 13-25 *; | [X]GB2316233 (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [X] 25,26 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 24 * * figure 2b *; | [X]US6408190 (YING ZHINONG [SE]) [X] 1,4,25 * figure 3 * * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 26 *; | [Y]US2002101382 (KONISHI TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,6,9,10,12-15,17,20,21,23 * figures 4-6,13 * * paragraphs [0120] - [0150] *; | [XY]US2002113736 (TOUTAIN YANN [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,25 * figures 1,14-16 * * paragraphs [0031] , [0051] , [0052] * [Y] 2,3,6,9,10,12-15,17,20,21,23; | [A]US2002163470 (NAGUMO SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * figures 4-6,10 ** paragraphs [0082] - [0092] - [0127] *; | [Y]US2002167446 (GOTO KAZUHIDE [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] *; | [A]US2003058176 (KEILEN DON [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] * |