EP1501162 - Phase array oxide-confined VCSELs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/04] | Phase array oxide-confined vcsels | ||
[2009/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chua, Christopher L. 636 Curie Drive San Jose CA 95123 / US | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254333.0 | 20.07.2004 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | US20030625811 | 23.07.2003 Original published format: US 625811 | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1501162 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1501162 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1501162 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/42, H01S5/183 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
H01S5/423 (EP,US);
H01S5/18313 (EP,US);
H01S5/18338 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/36] |
Former [2005/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Phasengekoppelte Anordnung von VCSELs mit Oxid-Begrenzung | [2010/14] | English: | Phase array oxide-confined VCSELs | [2009/49] | French: | Réseau de VCSELs en phase avec une couche de confinement à oxyde | [2005/04] |
Former [2005/04] | Phasengekoppelte Anordnung von Oxyd-isolierten VCSEL | ||
Former [2005/04] | Phase array oxide-confined vcsels | Examination procedure | 28.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.08.2008 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 21.08.2008 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0858137 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 5,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 54 * * column 7, line 52 - column 10, line 48 *; | [X]US2001028667 (KANEKO TAKEO [JP]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0002] - [0053]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1225669 (AVALON PHOTONICS LTD [CH]) [A] 2,4,6 * column 4, lines 9-25 *; | [A]WO02089272 (PHOTODIGM [US]) [A] 2,4,6 * page 1 - page 7; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2003108075 (KIM SEONGSIN [US], et al) [Y] 5,7* column 1, line 59 - column 5, line 32; figures 1-6 *; | [Y] - HUFFAKER D L ET AL, "FABRICATION OF HIGH-PACKING-DENSITY VERTICAL CAVITY SURFACE- EMITTING LASER ARRAYS USING SELECTIVE OXIDATION", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19960501), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 596 - 598, XP000589251 [Y] 1,5,7 * pages 596-598; figures 1,3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.491550 | [Y] - DEPPE D G ET AL, "PHASE-COUPLED TWO-DIMENSIONAL ALXGA1-XAS-GAAS VERTICAL-CAVITY SURFACE-EMITTING LASER ARRAY", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19900521), vol. 56, no. 21, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2089 - 2091, XP000149946 [Y] 1 * page 2089 - page 2090; figures 1,3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.102981 | by applicant | US2001028667 |