EP1621147 - Band ligator for surgical treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taewoong Medical Co., Ltd. 610, Ilsan Techno-Town, 1141-1, Backsuk-dong, Ilsan-ku Koyang-si Kyungg-do 411-360 / KR | For all designated states Shin, Kyong-Min 265-80, Hongeun-3-dong Seodaemun-ku Seoul 157-765 / KR | [2007/25] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Taewoong Medical Co., Ltd. 610, Ilsan Techno-Town, 1141-1, Backsuk-dong, Ilsan-ku Koyang-si Kyunggi-do 411-360 / KR | ||
For all designated states Shin, Kyong-Min 265-80, Hongeun-3-dong Seodaemun-ku Seoul 157-765 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shin, Kyong-min 265-080, Hongeun-3-dong Seodaemun-ku Seoul 157-765 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jong-taek 149-44, Younhee-3-dong Seodaemun-ku Seoul 120-826 / KR | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2006/05] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254559.0 | 29.07.2004 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621147 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621147 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1621147 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
A61B17/12013 (EP);
A61B2017/12018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/40] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgische Vorrichtung zur Gummibandligatur | [2006/05] | English: | Band ligator for surgical treatment | [2006/05] | French: | Ligateur chirurgical aux bandes élastiques | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.03.2007 | IT | 28.03.2007 | DE | 28.05.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | IT | 28.03.2007 | |
DE | 28.05.2007 | ||
FR | 16.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | DE | 28.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5398844 (ZASLAVSKY ELLA [US], et al); | [A]WO9745060 (ACT MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1,4 * figure 7 *; | [A]US5853416 (TOLKOFF MARC JOSHUA [US]) [A] 1,4* figures 3,7 *; | [A]US2004006256 (SUZUKI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US5398844 | US6007551 |