EP1503045 - Turbine active seal assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2009/23] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turnquist, Norman Arnold 1432 Corbin Hill Road Sloansville New York 12160 / US | 02 /
Dinc, Osman Saim 107 Nyroy Drive Troy New York 12180 / US | 03 /
Demiroglu, Mehmet 2434 22nd Street Troy New York 12180 / US | 04 /
Fang, Biao 6B Lacosta Drive Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | 05 /
Sarshar, Hamid Reza 154 East Elm Crescent The Woodlands Texas 77382 / US | 06 /
Burnett, Mark Edward 3099 NY Route 67 Buskirk New York 12028 / US | 07 /
Baily, Frederick George 4989 Jockey Street Ballston Spa New York 12020 / US | 08 /
Safi, Ahmad R-4 Hassan Ap. Extension Block 13-D Gulshan-E Lobal Karachi / PK | 09 /
Aksit, Mahmut Faruk Istasyon CAD, 13/23 Erenkoy 81070 Istanbul / TR | 10 /
Larsen, Richard Robert 4153 Shady Lane Cookeville Tennessee 38506 / US | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2005/05] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254576.4 | 30.07.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | US20030632453 | 31.07.2003 Original published format: US 632453 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1503045 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1503045 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1503045 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/16, F16J15/44 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
F16J15/445 (EP,US);
F01D11/025 (EP,US);
F04D27/0292 (EP,US);
F04D29/102 (EP,US);
F16J15/3288 (EP,US);
F16J15/442 (EP,US);
F05D2240/55 (EP,US);
F05D2240/56 (EP,US);
F05D2250/182 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/05] | F01D25/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/50] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aktive elektrostatische Dichtung für Turbinenanlage | [2005/05] | English: | Turbine active seal assembly | [2005/05] | French: | Joint actif pour moteurs à turbine | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2279814 (DICKINSON EDGAR D) [A] 6 * page 1, column 2, lines 37-54 * * page 2, column 1, lines 2-15 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2279863 (DOWNER JOHN M) [A] 6 * page 1, column 2, lines 28-41 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003080510 (DINC OSMAN SAIM [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0014] ** figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2003102630 (DINC OSMAN SAIM [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0029] , [0033] - [0037] * * figures 1,7,8,12-15 * | by applicant | US2003102630 |