EP1510759 - Combustor dome assembly of a gas turbine engine having a contoured swirler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMasters, Marie Ann 6954 Owlwood Drive Mason Ohio 45040 / US | 02 /
Vermeersch, Michael Louis 6240 Dewberry Court Hamilton Ohio 45011 / US | 03 /
Danis, Allen Michael 8463 Charleston Valley Drive Mason Ohio 45040 / US | 04 /
Cooper, James Neil 4806 Beaver Court Hamilton Ohio 45011 / US | 05 /
Thomsen, Duane Douglas 6688 Oakland Road Loveland Ohio 45140 / US | 06 /
Cimmarusti, Gregory Allen 4476 N. Mallard Cove Mason Ohio 45040 / US | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2005/09] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254713.3 | 05.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | US20030638506 | 11.08.2003 Original published format: US 638506 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510759 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/00 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
F23R3/10 (EP,US);
F23R3/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/47] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brennkammer für eine Gasturbine mit einer konturierten Dralleinrichtung | [2005/09] | English: | Combustor dome assembly of a gas turbine engine having a contoured swirler | [2005/09] | French: | Chambre de combustion pour une turbine à gaz avec un tourbilloneur contourné | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2107448 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 123 - page 2, line 17 * * page 2, line 52 - line 103; figures 2,5 *; | [YA]US5307637 (STICKLES RICHARD W [US], et al) [Y] 1,3 * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 45; figures 2,3 * [A] 6; | [YDA]US6314739 (HOWELL STEPHEN J [US], et al) [YD] 1,3 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 62; figures 1,2 * [A] 6; | [AD]US6381964 (PRITCHARD JR BYRON ANDREW [US], et al) [AD] 1,6* the whole document * |