EP1510530 - Method of separating a polymer from a solvent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Sabic Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silvi, Norberto 10 Muirfield Lane Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | 02 /
Giammattei, Mark H. 21 Fox Street Selkirk New York 12158 / US | 03 /
Keulen, Jan P. Sparrenlaan 4 4641 GA Ossendrecht / NL | 04 /
Woodruff, David W. 20 Valencia Lane Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | 05 /
Wilson, Paul R. 35 Vandenbrug Lane Latham New York 12110 / US | 06 /
Buckley, Paul W. 60 Paradowski Road Scotia New York 12110 / US | 07 /
Johnson, Norman Enoch 1251 Tanglewood Drive Mt. Vernon Indiana 47620 / US | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2009/27] |
Former [2007/40] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [2005/09] | Szary, Anne C., et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04255152.3 | 26.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | US20030648524 | 26.08.2003 Original published format: US 648524 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510530 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/10, C08F6/12, C08G63/89, C08G18/82, C08G64/40, C08G73/10, C08G75/20, C08G77/32, C08G65/46, B29C47/76 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
C08G65/46 (EP,US);
B29C48/268 (EP,US);
B29C48/767 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08F6/10 (EP,US);
C08F6/12 (EP,US);
C08G63/89 (EP,US);
C08G73/1053 (EP,US);
C08G75/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/47] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methode zur Isolierung eines Polymers aus einer Lösung | [2005/09] | English: | Method of separating a polymer from a solvent | [2005/09] | French: | Procédé d'isolation d'un polymère de sa solution | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 04.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2007 | Observations by third parties | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/16] | Request for further processing for: | 10.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.05.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1213467 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US3963558 (SKIDMORE RICHARD H) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US4686279 (NAGTZAAM NICOLAAS P [NL], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US5804111 (KOBAYASHI AKIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US6100366 (NAKATA YOSHITOMO [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO03106149 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [PX] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2003236384 (SILVI NORBERTO [US], et al) [PX] 1-14* the whole document * | other | EP0863167 | - UDO BARTSCH UND WERNER SCHULER, "Restentgasen von Kunststoffen unter Berücksichtigung der Rückbildung von Monomeren", UDO BARTSCH UND WERNER SCHULER, VEREIN DEUTSCHER INGENIEURE, Entgasen beim herstellen und Aufbereiten von Kunststoffen., DOSSELDORF, GERMANY, VEREIN DEUTSCHER INGENIEURE - VDI-GESELLSCHAFT KUNSTOFFTECHNIK, (1992), pages 199 - 236, ISBN 3-18-234164-2, XP003016917 |