EP1524550 - Cascaded deflectors for multi-channel optical switches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
aoki, Shigenori 752 Devonshire Way Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2005/16] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04255308.1 | 02.09.2004 | [2005/16] | Priority number, date | US20030688518 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: US 688518 | [2005/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1524550 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/295, G02F1/313, G02F1/03 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
G02F1/295 (EP,US);
G02F1/0316 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/02] |
Former [2005/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kaskadenartige Ablenkvorrichtung für optische Mehrkanalschalter | [2005/16] | English: | Cascaded deflectors for multi-channel optical switches | [2005/16] | French: | Déflecteurs en cascade pour commutateurs optiques multi-canaux | [2005/16] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 21.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3976360 (SCHRODER ECKHARD) [Y] 1-5,7,10-15,17,21,24 * column 1, line 22 - line 39 * * column 2, line 35 - line 61 * * column 4, line 38 - line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [DY]US6504966 (KATO MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [DY] 1-5,7,10-15,17,21,24* First Embodiment *;; figures 2-19 *; | [XY]US2003059148 (NISHIZAWA MOTOYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9-15,21,24 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0069]; figures 4A,4B,6 * [Y] 7,17 |