EP1516670 - Jaw crusher for aluminium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Okuya, Yasuaki 52, Soramachi Heisaka-cho Nishio-City Aichi-Pref. 444-0305 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Okuya, Yasuaki 52, Soramachi, Heisaka-cho Nishio-City, Aichi-Pref. 444-0305 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 04255468.3 | 09.09.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | JP20030326362 | 18.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003326362 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516670 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B02C1/04, B02C1/10 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B02C1/025 (EP,US);
B02C18/02 (KR);
B02C1/005 (KR);
B02C1/04 (EP,US);
B02C1/10 (EP,US);
B02C1/12 (KR);
B02C1/14 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | 05.08.2005 | HR | 05.08.2005 | LT | 05.08.2005 | LV | 05.08.2005 | MK | 05.08.2005 | Title | German: | Backenbrecher für Aluminium | [2005/39] | English: | Jaw crusher for aluminium | [2005/12] | French: | Concasseur à machoire pour aluminium | [2005/12] |
Former [2005/12] | backenbrecher für aluminium | Examination procedure | 05.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 14.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001138031 ; | [Y]DE1088785 (ALFRED KLEINKNECHT) [Y] 1,3-5* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1228805 (OKUYA YASUAKI [JP]) [Y] 1,3-5 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001138031 A 20010522 (OKUYA YASUAKI) [Y] 1,3-5 * abstract * |