EP1635462 - High efficiency switching power converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hutchins, Peter Laurence 25 The Paddock Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 6SD / GB | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Hardwick, John Frederick Parabola, 1 Richfield Place, Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ / GB | [2006/11] | Application number, filing date | 04255521.9 | 13.09.2004 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635462 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/0814, H02M3/335 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
H02M3/33569 (EP,US);
H02M3/33571 (EP,US);
H02M3/33573 (EP,US);
Y02P80/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/47] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltleistungswandler mit hohem Wirkungsgrad | [2006/11] | English: | High efficiency switching power converter | [2006/11] | French: | Convertisseur de puissance à découpage à haute efficacité | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/22] | 03.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.10.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2319068 (TELEFONBAU & NORMALZEIT GMBH) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [Y] 14; | [A]EP0490639 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0496718 (EUROP AGENCE SPATIALE [FR]); | [E]GB2399700 (HUTCHINS PETER LAURENCE [GB]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X] - PEREZ M A ET AL, "The forward discharge converter (FDC): a general solution to obtain soft-switching in any power converter", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE (PESC). TOLEDO, JUNE 29 - JULY 3, 1992, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920629), VOL. 2 CONF. 23, ISBN 0-7803-0695-3, pages 101 - 108, XP010064708 [X] 1-8,11-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1992.254697 | [Y] - JINNO M ET AL, "An efficient active LC snubber for multi-output converters with flyback synchronous rectifier", PESC'03. 2003 IEEE 34TH. ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. ACAPULCO, MEXICO, JUNE 15 - 19, 2003, ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030615), VOL. 4 OF 4. CONF. 34, ISBN 0-7803-7754-0, pages 622 - 627, XP010648882 [Y] 14 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.2003.1218127 |