EP1526478 - Data processing apparatus, data processing method, program and recording medium for interpolating data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujishiro, Shigeo c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitasinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Someya, Ikuo c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitasinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Horner, David Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Horner, David Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04256502.8 | 21.10.2004 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | JP20030361505 | 22.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003361505 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1526478 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1526478 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
G06T3/4007 (EP,US);
G06T3/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/01] |
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Datenverarbeitungsverfahren, Programm und Datenaufzeichnungsmedium zur Interpolation von Daten | [2005/17] | English: | Data processing apparatus, data processing method, program and recording medium for interpolating data | [2005/17] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de données, procédé de traitement de données, logiciel et support correspondant d'enregistrement de données pour l'interpolation de données | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 06.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0367418 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 5, line 13 - line 20 *; | [A]US5335296 (LARKIN ROSS M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 10, line 53 - line 68 *; | [A]EP0814600 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [X]US6018597 (MALTSEV PAVEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - line 34 * * column 5, line 35 - line 40 *; | [A]US6360029 (MOLLER CHRISTIAN HENRIK LUJA [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 10, line 8 - line 15 * |