EP1583294 - Paying transaction in a peer-to-peer radio communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/43] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Yoshiyuki 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/37] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
Okada, Yoshiyuki 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-85 / JP | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04256567.1 | 25.10.2004 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040102943 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004102943 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1583294 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1583294 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583294 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, // H04L29/06 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
H04L67/104 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (EP,US);
H04W76/14 (EP,US);
H04L2463/101 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/40] | H04L12/56, H04Q7/22, H04L12/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/43] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zahlungstransaktion in einer Peer-to-Peer Kommunikation | [2005/40] | English: | Paying transaction in a peer-to-peer radio communication | [2005/40] | French: | Transaction de paiement dans une communication radio poste à poste | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 14.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0715245 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 29 - line 42 * * page 6, line 45 - line 58 ** claim 1 *; | [AD]JP2003333079 (SKYLEY NETWORKS KK) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * |