EP1529548 - Flower catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster, Inc. 3333 Diamond Canyon Road Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [2007/37] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states Biosense Webster, Inc. 3333 Diamond Canyon Road Diamond Bar, California 91765 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bautista, Richard 7610 Marine Avenue Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730 / US | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/19] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04256813.9 | 04.11.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | US20030704295 | 07.11.2003 Original published format: US 704295 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1529548 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1529548 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529548 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01, A61B5/042 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/6856 (EP,US);
A61B5/287 (EP,US);
A61M25/0043 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/19] | A61M25/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2006/27] |
Former [2005/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blumenform Katheter | [2005/19] | English: | Flower catheter | [2005/19] | French: | Cathéter en forme de fleur | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5730704 (AVITALL BOAZ [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 57; figures 1A-2E *; | [A]US5897554 (CHIA WENG-KWEN RAYMOND [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 53; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2002133150 (WHAYNE JAMES G [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0297] - [0304]; figures 56-60 *; | [A]US2002183638 (SWANSON DAVID K [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0093] - [0104]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0166] - [0177]; figures 9-13B * * paragraphs [0212] - [0220]; figures 23-27 *; | [A]US2003171746 (FLEISCHMAN SIDNEY D [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0082] - [0088]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0096] - [0099]; figures 1-11B * * paragraphs [0154] - [0162]; figures 29-35 * * paragraphs [0173] - [0178]; figures 41-43 * * paragraphs [0199] - [0206]; figures 55-60B * |