EP1533434 - Reinforced fiber panel and method of forming same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonoco Development, Inc. 1 North Second Street, Hartsville South Carolina 29550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Sonoco Development, Inc. 1 North Second Street Hartsville, South Carolina 29550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renck, Lawrence E. 1760 Lakeview Boulevard Hartsville, South Carolina 29550 / US | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2005/21] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04256949.1 | 10.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | US20030716775 | 19.11.2003 Original published format: US 716775 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533434 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/36, E04C2/34, E04C2/16, B28B3/00, B28B1/52 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
E04C2/16 (EP,US);
E04C2/365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2006/20] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, LI | ||
Former [2006/07] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vestärkte Faserplatte und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2005/21] | English: | Reinforced fiber panel and method of forming same | [2005/21] | French: | Panneau de fibres renforcé et procédé de fabrication associé | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 28.11.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/51] | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/51] | Request for further processing for: | 17.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.02.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2006 | 08.02.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2006 | 08.02.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2006 | 08.02.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2006 | 08.02.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB794217 (BLACKBURN & GENERAL AIRCRAFT L, et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XY]FR1431299 (BUEHLER AG GEB) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * the whole document * [Y] 6,8,9; | [DA]US4702870 (SETTERHOLM VANCE C [US], et al) [DA] 11-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5177924 (KAKUK STEFAN [DE]) [X] 11,12 * column 3, line 6 - column 6, line 64; figures 1-3 * [A] 3; | [YA]US2002014051 (FRAVAL HANAFI R [US], et al) [Y] 6,8,9 * paragraphs [0037] - [0053]; figures 1,5 * [A] 11-15; | [Y]CA2350688 (PACTIV CORP [US]) [Y] 6,9 * page 3, line 22 - page 6, line 17; figures 3,4 * |