EP1555551 - Apparatus for compactly coupling an optical fiber and a planar optical waveguide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/29] | Method and apparatus for compactly coupling an optical fiber and a planar optical wave guide | ||
[2009/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Madsen, Christi Kay 436 Joan Street South Plainfield, NJ 07080 / US | 02 /
Rasras, Mahmoud 29 Gales Drive, Apt. 1 New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2005/29] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Ltd 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04257338.6 | 25.11.2004 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | US20040756522 | 13.01.2004 Original published format: US 756522 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1555551 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1555551 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/122, G02B6/30, G02B6/14 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
G02B6/305 (EP,US);
G02B6/26 (KR);
G02B27/00 (KR);
G02B6/1228 (EP,US);
G02B6/132 (EP,US);
G02B6/136 (EP,US);
G02B2006/12173 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/15] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Apparat zur kompakten Kupplung einer optischen Faser und eines planaren Wellenleiters | [2009/43] | English: | Apparatus for compactly coupling an optical fiber and a planar optical waveguide | [2009/43] | French: | Dispositif pour realiser un couplage compact entre une fibre optique et un guide d'onde optique planaire | [2009/43] |
Former [2005/29] | Methode und Apparat zur kompakten Kupplung einer optischen Faser und eines planaren Wellenleiters | ||
Former [2005/29] | Method and apparatus for compactly coupling an optical fiber and a planar optical wave guide | ||
Former [2005/29] | Methode et dispositif pour realiser un couplage compact entre une fibre optique et un guide d'onde optique planaire | Examination procedure | 13.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0731366 (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0001]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0083] - [0087] *; | [Y]EP1195633 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 53 - line 58 * * column 3, line 24 - line 46 *; | [A] - WEISSMAN Z ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF PERIODICALLY SEGMENTED WAVEGUIDE MODE EXPANDERS", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19951001), vol. 13, no. 10, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 2053 - 2058, XP000604439 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.469728 | [A] - DORGEUILLE,F ET. AL., OPTICS LETTERS, (19950315), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 581 - 583, XP002317737 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.20.000581 |