EP1542189 - Remote control of an information processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshio, Taichi 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Higashiyama, Satoru 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hashimoto, Hirokazu 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Toshiyuki 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO., 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04257543.1 | 03.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | JP20030404436 | 03.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003404436 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1542189 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1542189 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08C17/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G08C17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/38] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fernsteuerung eines Informationsverarbeitungssystems | [2005/24] | English: | Remote control of an information processing system | [2005/24] | French: | Télécommande d'un système de traitement d'information | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 15.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9957648 (ART ADVANCED RECOGNITION TECH [US], et al) [X] 1-16* abstract *; | [X]EP1146739 (ACTV INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0015] , [0031]; figure 4 *; | [E]EP1082671 (ART ADVANCED RECOGNITION TECH [IL]) [E] 1-16 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] , [0001] , [0014] - [0018]; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | EP1082671 |