EP1545004 - Semiconductor switch with a multi-state driver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Power Integrations, Inc. 5245 Hellyer Avenue San Jose, California 95138 / US | [2008/23] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Power Integrations, Inc. 5245 Hellyer Avenue San Jose, California 95138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pham, Giao Minh 210 Edgewater Drive Milpitas California 95035 / US | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Johnson, Terence Leslie, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London, WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/39] | Johnson, Terence Leslie, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04257648.8 | 09.12.2004 | [2005/25] | Priority number, date | US20030742545 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 742545 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545004 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545004 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/003 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
H03K17/164 (EP,US);
H03K17/04206 (EP,US);
H03K17/167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2006/11] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterschalter mit Mehrzustand-Treiber | [2005/25] | English: | Semiconductor switch with a multi-state driver | [2005/25] | French: | Commutateur à semi-conducteur avec circuit d'attaque à niveaux multiples | [2005/25] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09152724.2 / EP2107652 | EP10176425.6 / EP2256928 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5231311 (FERRY THOMAS V [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11-16 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5285116 (THAIK ALBERT [US]) [X] 1-6,11-16 * figure 4 *; | [X]US5859552 (DO TUAN P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13* figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1221771 |