EP1542492 - Mobile device and method for determining location of a mobile device in a WLAN network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/24] | Mobile device and method for determining location of a mobile device | ||
[2006/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meunier, Jean-Luc 285 Chemin du Cerf 38330 Saint Nazaire Les Eymes / FR | 02 /
Snowdon, Dave 8 Avenue de L'îlette 06600 Antibes / FR | [2005/38] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
Meunier, Jean-Luc 285 Chemin du Cerf 38330 Saint Nazaire Les Eymes / FR | ||
02 /
Snowdon, Dave 2 Rue des Bergers 38000 Grenoble / FR | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04257672.8 | 09.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | US20030735554 | 12.12.2003 Original published format: US 735554 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542492 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1542492 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
G01S5/021 (EP,US);
G01S5/0252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/10] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobifunklgerät und Verfahren zur Positionsbestimmung eines Mobilfunkgeräts in einem WLAN-Netz | [2006/41] | English: | Mobile device and method for determining location of a mobile device in a WLAN network | [2006/41] | French: | Dispositif mobile et procédé pour déterminer la position d'un dispositif mobile dan un réseau local sans fil | [2006/41] |
Former [2005/24] | Mobifunklgerät und Verfahren zur Positionsbestimmung eines Mobilfunkgeräts | ||
Former [2005/24] | Mobile device and method for determining location of a mobile device | ||
Former [2005/24] | Dispositif mobile et procédé pour déterminer la position d'un dispositif mobile | Examination procedure | 15.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 16.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001022558 (KARR CHARLES L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0839] *; | [A]US2002101375 (STILP LOUIS A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] *; | [A]WO03021851 (NEWBURY NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0024] *; | [AD] - BAHL P ET AL, "RADAR: an in-building RF-based user location and tracking system", INFOCOM 2000. NINETEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE TEL AVIV, ISRAEL 26-30 MARCH 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20000326), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-5880-5, pages 775 - 784, XP010376167 [AD] 1-10 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.2000.832252 | [AD] - PAUL CASTRO, PATRICK CHIU, TED KREMENEK, RICHARD MUNTZ, "a probabilistic room location service for wireless networked environments", UBICOMP - UCLA DEPARTMENT OF COMPUTER SCIENCE,, LOS ANGELES, (2001), pages 18 - 34, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/app/home/contribution.asp?wasp=4ed85d2c9d5f4d72a75d2a9f941f682c&referrer=parent&backto=issue,3,31;journal,1204,1955;linkingpublicationresults,1:105633,1, (20050324), XP002322402 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45427-6_3 |