EP1548511 - Emulsion aggregation toner having surface morphology properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vandewinckel, Judith M. 4161 Frost Hollow Road Livonia, NY 14487 / US | 02 /
Marcello, Vincenzo G. 780 Lauren Court Webster, New York 14580 / US | 03 /
Cheng, Chieh-Min 26 Cardogan Square Rochester, NY 14625 / US | 04 /
Kmiecik-Lawrynowicz, Grazyna E. 14 Winding Brook Drive Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 05 /
Hwee NG, T. 3205 Coldstream Road Mississauga, Ontario L5L 5H9 / CA | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04257732.0 | 13.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | US20030743096 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: US 743096 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1548511 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1548511 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08, G03G9/097 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
G03G9/08708 (EP,US);
G03G9/0806 (EP,US);
G03G9/0819 (EP,US);
G03G9/0827 (EP,US);
G03G9/08711 (EP,US);
G03G9/08782 (EP,US);
G03G9/09708 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/37] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elmulsions-/Aggregation-Toner mit morphologischen Oberflächeneigenschaften | [2005/26] | English: | Emulsion aggregation toner having surface morphology properties | [2005/26] | French: | Toner d'émulsification et d'aggrégation | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/22] | 22.04.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2013 | 17.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5747215 (ONG BENG S [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * example v *; | [X]US6120967 (HOPPER MICHAEL A [CA], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 11 - column 12; example 1 *; | [A]US6210853 (PATEL RAJ D [CA], et al) [A] 1-10* example 1 *; | [X]WO03087949 (AVECIA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * claims 1,3 * * page 13, line 3 - page 14, line 16 * * page 15; examples a-1 * * page 17; example 4.1 * * page 17, line 28 * | by applicant | US5462828 | WO03087949 |