EP1548285 - Method and apparatus for detecting compressor stall precursors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krok, Michael Joseph 40 Spice Mill Boulevard Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | 02 /
Kande, Mallikarjun Shivaraya 51/1, Kadirena Palya Indira Nagar Bangalore 560038 / IN | 03 /
Venkateswaran, Narayanan 421A, 1 Cross Church Road New Thippasandra Bangalore 560075 / IN | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/37] |
Former [2005/26] | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04257835.1 | 16.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | US20030744617 | 23.12.2003 Original published format: US 744617 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1548285 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1548285 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F04D27/02 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
F04D27/001 (EP,US);
F05D2270/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2013/17] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Bestimmung von Indikatoren für Pumpen | [2005/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for detecting compressor stall precursors | [2005/26] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour détection des précurseurs de décollement | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 16.02.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 05.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1256726 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document ** figures 2-4 *; | [XI] - T. LE ET AL, "A flexible and approximate computing approach for time-frequency distributions", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (20000401), vol. 48, no. 4, doi:10.1109/78.827553, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 1193 - 1196, XP055030901 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * * page 1193, right column, lines 5-18 * * page 1194, right column, lines 1-34 * * page 1195, chapter "IV. Example" * [I] 6-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.827553 | [XI] - I.M DREMIN ET AL, "Precursors of stall and surge processes in gas turbines revealed by wavelet analysis", CONTROL ENGINEERING PRACTICE, (20020601), vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S0967-0661(02)00005-9, ISSN 0967-0661, pages 599 - 604, XP055030964 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * page 600, left column, lines 5-39 * * page 602, left column, lines 24-52 * [I] 7-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0967-0661(02)00005-9 | [XI] - DIRK C. LEINHOS ET AL, "The Influence of Transient Inlet Distortions on the Instability Inception of a Low-Pressure Compressor in a Turbofan Engine", JOURNAL OF TURBOMACHINERY, (20010101), vol. 123, no. 1, doi:10.1115/1.1330271, ISSN 0889-504X, pages 1 - 8, XP055030963 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * * page 2, right column, lines 8-14 * * page 3, right column, line 4 - page 4, right column, line 13 * * figures 3,5,6 * [I] 4-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1115/1.1330271 | [X] - M. INOUE ET AL, "Short and Long Length-Scale Disturbances Leading to Rotating Stall in an Axial Compressor Stage With Different Stator/Rotor Gaps", JOURNAL OF TURBOMACHINERY, (20020101), vol. 124, no. 3, doi:10.1115/1.1458022, ISSN 0889-504X, pages 376 - 384, XP055030965 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * * page 377, right column, line 35 - page 378, left column, line 32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1115/1.1458022 |