EP1547972 - Oxygen sorbent compositions and methods of using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue, Murray Hill New Providence, NJ 07974-2082 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Providence, New Jersey 07974-2082 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bülow, Martin 54 Jamestown Road Basking Ridge New Jersey 07920 / US | 02 /
Böer, Jürgen Taschenberg 7 99734 Nordhausen / DE | 03 /
Burckhardt, Wolfgang Lahnsteiner Strasse 6g 07629 Hermsdorf / DE | 04 /
Guth, Hans Ulrich Karl-Schildener-Strasse 2 17491 Greifswald / DE | 05 /
Ullmann, Helmut Burgwart-Strasse 13a 01705 Freital / DE | 06 /
Vashook, Vladimir V. Schnorr-Strasse 32 10169 Dresden / DE | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al The Linde Group Intellectual Property Department The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Wickham, Michael, et al The Linde Group Intellectual Property Department The Priestley Centre 10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7XY / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | Wickham, Michael The BOC Group plc, Chertsey Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04258017.5 | 21.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | US20030531780P | 22.12.2003 Original published format: US 531780 P | US20040005408 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: US 5408 | US20040005422 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: US 5422 | US20040005579 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: US 5579 | US20040005411 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: US 5411 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1547972 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1547972 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/38, C01B13/02, B01D53/04, B01D53/047, C04B35/01, C04B35/26, C04B35/45 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
C04B35/01 (EP);
B01D53/02 (EP);
C01B13/0255 (EP);
C01B3/382 (EP);
C04B35/2683 (EP);
C04B35/4508 (EP);
B01D2251/40 (EP);
B01D2253/106 (EP);
B01D2253/1124 (EP);
B01D2253/25 (EP);
B01D2253/304 (EP);
B01D2253/3425 (EP);
B01D2257/104 (EP);
B01D2259/40086 (EP);
B01D53/0462 (EP);
B01D53/047 (EP);
C01B2203/0244 (EP);
C01B2203/0844 (EP);
C01B2203/1258 (EP);
C01B2203/142 (EP);
C01B2203/82 (EP);
C01B2210/0046 (EP);
C04B2235/3208 (EP);
C04B2235/3213 (EP);
C04B2235/3215 (EP);
C04B2235/3225 (EP);
C04B2235/3272 (EP);
C04B2235/3275 (EP);
C04B2235/3281 (EP);
C04B2235/408 (EP);
C04B2235/768 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Sauerstoff-Sorbentien-Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Verwendung derselbe | [2005/31] | English: | Oxygen sorbent compositions and methods of using same | [2005/26] | French: | Compositions de sorbants d'oxygène et procédés pour utiliser lesmême. | [2005/31] |
Former [2005/26] | Sauerstoff-Sorbentien-Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Verwendung derselben | ||
Former [2005/26] | Compositions de sorbants d'oxygène et procédés pour utiliser les mêmes | Examination procedure | 30.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/50] | 23.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 01.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPH054044 ; | [A]EP0995715 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1,5,6,26,27,29* the whole document *; | [A]US6059858 (LIN YUE-SHENG [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6,25,28 * the whole document *; | [X] - L. ER-RAKHO ET AL., "The oxygen deficient perovskites AFe1-xCuxO2.5-x/2+delta (A=Sr, Ba) exhibiting mixed valence of iron and copper ions", J. PHYS. CHEM. SOLIDS, (1988), vol. 49, no. 9, pages 1101 - 1106, XP002321350 [X] 1 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3697(88)90160-6 | [X] - ASHUTOSH TIWARI AND K.P.RAJEEV, "Effect of oxygen stoichiometry on the electrical resistivity behaviour of NdNiO3-delta", SOLID STATE COMMUNICATIONS, (1999), vol. 109, pages 119 - 124, XP002321351 [X] 1 * figure 1 * | [X] - TIWARI A ET AL, "Electrical transport in LaNiO3-[delta] (0<=[delta]<=0.14)", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (1999), Database accession no. 6298768, XP002321352 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - ABBATE M ET AL, "Electronic structure and metal-insulator transition in LaNiO3-[delta]", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (2002), Database accession no. 7265938, XP002321353 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930521), vol. 017, no. 259, Database accession no. (C - 1061), & JP05004044 A 19930114 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [XD] 1 * whole document, but in particular paragraph 0015 * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, CONDENSED MATTER, (19990426), vol. 11, no. 16, ISSN 0953-8984, pages 3291 - 3298 | [ ] - PHYSICAL REVIEW B, CONDENSED MATTER AND MATERIALS PHYSICS, (20020415), vol. 65, no. 15, ISSN 0163-1829, pages 155101/1 - 6 | Examination | JPH03221125 | EP1044924 | US2003153632 | - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 45, Database accession no. 1991-329749, & JPH03221125 A 19910930 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA) |