EP1547836 - Shade apparatus for vehicle sun roofs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP | For all designated states Ashimori Industry Co., Ltd. 10-18, Kitahorie 3-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0014 / JP | [2009/10] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP | ||
For all designated states Ashimori Industry Co., Ltd. 10-18, Kitahorie 3-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katada, Naochika 3-8-302 Sakaehonmachi Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-0058 / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Shinji, c/o Intellectual Property Department Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
Sawada, Kazuki c/o Aisin Engineering Co., Ltd. 1-15 Hachikencho, Kariya Aichi, 448-8605 / JP | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
Katada, Naochika 3-8-302 Sakaehonmachi Ikeda-shi Osaka 563-0058 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakai, Shinji, c/o Intellectual Property Departement Aisin Seiki K.K. 1 Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi-ke 448-8650 / JP | |||
03 /
Sawada, Kazuki c/o Aisin Engineering Co. Ltd. 1-15 Hachikencho Kariya aichi 448-8605 / JP | |||
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
Katada, Naochika 3-8-302 Sakaehonmachi Ikeda-shi Osaka 563-0058 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakai, Shinji, Intellectual Property Departement Aisin Seiki K.K. 1 Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi-ke 448-8650 / JP | |||
03 /
Sawada, Kazuki Aisin Engineering Co. Ltd. 1-15 Hachikencho Kariya aichi 448-8605 / JP | Representative(s) | Marshall, John Grahame SERJEANTS 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Marshall, John Grahame SERJEANTS 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 04258078.7 | 23.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | JP20030434351 | 26.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003434351 | JP20030434482 | 26.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003434482 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1547836 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1547836 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1547836 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
B60J7/0015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2007/43] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sonnenschutz für KFZ-Schiebedächer | [2005/26] | English: | Shade apparatus for vehicle sun roofs | [2005/26] | French: | Pare-soleil pour toit coulissant de véhicule | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 16.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH05199933 (DEFUIKUSU DEEREMAN GMBH) [DX] 6-8 * the whole document *; | [DX]JPH0685109U (XXX) [DX] 6-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]JPH0976760 (DAIKYO WEBASTO) [DA] 1,6* the whole document *; | [A]EP1112876 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document * |