EP1551184 - Residue image downsampling and encoding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Woo-shik 109-1106 Dongseong 1 -cha Apt., 501 Jukjeon 2-dong Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Hyun Mun 122-402 Park Town, 54 Sunae-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04258101.7 | 23.12.2004 | [2005/27] | Priority number, date | KR20030098237 | 27.12.2003 Original published format: KR 2003098237 | KR20040107158 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: KR 2004107158 | US20040551778P | 11.03.2004 Original published format: US 551778 P | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1551184 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1551184 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/46, H04N7/50 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
H04N1/646 (EP);
H04N19/105 (EP);
H04N19/132 (EP);
H04N19/136 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP);
H04N19/186 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/10] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Fehlerbildunterabtastung und -kodierung | [2005/27] | English: | Residue image downsampling and encoding method | [2005/27] | French: | Procédé pour le sous-échantillonage et le codage d'une image résiduelle | [2005/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 09.04.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/36] | 22.04.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP10165464.8 / EP2224724 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9800980 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [X] 59-61 * page 5, line 13 - page 7, line 39 * * figures 1,3A,3B * [A] 1-58,62; | [A]WO9955013 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-62* page 20, line 1 - page 22, line 26 *; | [XA]US6108383 (MILLER DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 59-61 * column 8, line 15 - line 26 * * column 10, line 56 - column 12, line 20 * * figure 1 * [A] 1-58,62; | [XA] - "Recommendation H.263: Video coding for low bit rate communication", ITU-T DRAFT RECOMMENDATION H.263, (199802), pages 1 - 167, XP002176560 [X] 1-58,62 * page 4, paragraph 3.4.9 * * page 9 - page 13, paragraph 4.2 * * page 23 - page 27, paragraphs 5.1.3,5.1.4 * * page 85 - page 88, paragraphs K.1,K.2 * * pages 129-142, paragraph Q.1 - paragraph Q.7.2 * * figure 3/H.263 * * figure Q.1/H.263 * [A] 59-61 | [A] - PLOMPEN R, "Motion video coding for visual telephony", MOTION VIDEO CODING FOR VISUAL TELEPHONY. PROEFSCHRIFT, LEIDSCHENDAM, PTT RESEARCH NEHER LAB, NL, (1990), pages 38 - 43, XP002369764 [A] 1-62 * page 40, line 9 - page 41, line 2 * * figure 2.12 * | [A] - WIEGAND T, "TEXT OF FINAL COMMITTEE DRAFT OF JOINT VIDEO SPECIFICATION (ITU-T REC. H.264 / ISO/IEC 14496-10 AVC)MPEG02/N4920", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 MPEG02/N4920, KLAGENFURT,, AT, (200207), pages I - XV,1, XP001100641 [A] 1-62 * page 67 - page 72, paragraph 8.5 * * Figure 8-11 * | [A] - KOBAYASHI M ET AL, "Lossless compression for RGB color still images", IMAGE PROCESSING, 1999. ICIP 99. PROCEEDINGS. 1999 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KOBE, JAPAN 24-28 OCT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991024), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-5467-2, pages 73 - 77, XP010368688 [A] 1-62 * page 74 - page 75, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1999.819522 | Examination | - MALVAR H ET AL, "YCoCg-R: A Color Space with RGB Reversibility and Low Dynamic Range", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20030722), pages 1 - 5, XP002363382 |