EP1553750 - Communication terminal having adjustable hearing and/or speech characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPG Electronics 504 Limited Trafalgar Court Les Banques St Peter Port Guernsey GY1 3QL / GB | [2009/31] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states T&A Mobile Phones Limited Room 1502, 15F, Tower 6 China Hong Kong City 33 Canton Road Tsim Sha Tsui Kowloon / HK | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kabs, Joachim, Dr. Kirchweg 7 95490 Mistelgau / DE | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Clare Josephine Coller IP Management Fugro House Hithercroft Road Wallingford Oxfordshire OX10 9RB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Clare Josephine Coller IP Management Limited Fugro House Hithercroft Road Wallingford Oxfordshire OX10 9RB / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Feray, Valérie Feray Lenne Consult 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony / FR | ||
Former [2005/28] | Feray, Valérie Feray Lenne Conseil 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand 92160 Antony / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290056.3 | 08.01.2004 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553750 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553750 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/60 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
H04R5/04 (EP);
H04M1/6008 (EP);
H04M1/6016 (EP);
H04R2205/041 (EP);
H04R2499/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] |
Former [2006/14] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationsendgerät mit einstellbaren Gehör- und/oder Sprachmerkmalen | [2005/28] | English: | Communication terminal having adjustable hearing and/or speech characteristics | [2005/28] | French: | Terminal de communication à caractérisitiques ajustables d'audition et/ou de parole | [2005/28] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.02.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | 21.02.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.02.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   08.03.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2010 | BE | 07.07.2010 | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | IE | 08.01.2011 | LU | 08.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
TR | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
IE | 08.01.2011 | ||
LU | 08.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
IE | 08.01.2011 | ||
LU | 08.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
IE | 08.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | SI | 07.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9851124 (ROLM SYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,10 * abstract * * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 14; figures 2A,2B * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 15; figure 5 *; | [X]US6212496 (CAMPBELL LOWELL [US], et al) [X] 1,4-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - line 49; figure 1 * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 50 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 54 *; | [XY]US6381469 (WOJICK SCOTT [US]) [X] 1,4-6,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - line 30 * * column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 28 * * column 6, line 10 - column 7, line 12 * [Y] 2,3; | [X]US2002111796 (NEMOTO YASUSHI [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1A-1C * * paragraph [0044]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0062] *; | [Y]US2003014246 (CHOI I-WON [KR]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0059]; figures 4-6 *; | [A]EP1315362 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 2,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0015]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024]; figures 6,7 ** paragraph [0038] * |