EP1562130 - A process for modifying a curve in a computer-aided design system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dassault Systèmes 9, quai Marcel Dassault, B.P. 310 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR | [2005/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosel, Sébastien 48, allée de la Pommeraie 91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Cabinet Hirsch 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290320.3 | 06.02.2004 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1562130 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, G06K9/22, G06K9/48 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
G06T11/203 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methode für das Modifizieren einer Kurve in einem CAD-System | [2005/32] | English: | A process for modifying a curve in a computer-aided design system | [2005/32] | French: | Méthode pour modifier une courbe dans un système de conception assistée par ordinateur | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.03.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.03.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.03.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9532485 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 9-14 * abstract * * page 3, lines 23-31 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0953944 (ADOBE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] , [0052] * * paragraphs [0073] , [0078] , [0079] * * paragraphs [0083] , [0085] * * figures 20a-g,23 *; | [A]EP1274045 (DASSAULT SYSTEMES [FR]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [X] - BAUDEL T, "A mark-based interaction paradigm for free-hand drawing", 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA, ACM, USA, (19941102), ISBN 0-89791-657-3, pages 185 - 192, XP002285774 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 186, column 2, paragraph 4 * * page 187, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 188, column 2, paragraph 2 * * figures 2-5,8,9 * | [A] - QIN S-F ET AL, "On-line segmentation of freehand sketches by knowledge-based nonlinear thresholding operations", PATTERN RECOGNITION, PERGAMON PRESS INC. ELMSFORD, N.Y, US, (200110), vol. 34, no. 10, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 1885 - 1893, XP004362578 [A] 9-14 * abstract * * page 1889, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 1890, column 1, paragraph 8 * * page 1891, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-3203(00)00122-9 |