EP1619584 - Memory allocation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jaluna SA 6, avenue Gustave Eiffel 78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boule, Ivan 17 Boulevard Richard Lenoir 75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
Lebée, Pierre 18 Rue des Genets 60800 Crépy eu Valois / FR | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins Liebigstrasse 39 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04290405.2 | 13.02.2004 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619584 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
G06F12/023 (EP,US);
G06F12/02 (KR);
G06F12/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Title | German: | Speicherzuordnung | [2006/04] | English: | Memory allocation | [2006/04] | French: | Attribution de mémoire | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 05.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5784699 (MCMAHON DOUGLAS JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,11-16,27-40,44-47 * column 2, line 66 - column 33, line 67 * * column 5, line 22 - line 39 * * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 8 * * column 11, line 13 - line 39 * [A] 3-5,10,17-26 [Y] 19-25; | [XY] - BOZMAN G ET AL, "Analysis of free-storage algorithms-revisited", IBM SYSTEMS JOURNAL, IBM CORP. ARMONK, NEW YORK, US, (1984), vol. 23, no. 1, ISSN 0018-8670, pages 44 - 64, XP002214576 [X] 1-8,17,18,39,40,44-47 * page 54, column R, line 21 - line 50 * [Y] 19-25 | [X] - OGASAWARA T, "An algorithm with constant execution time for dynamic storage allocation", REAL-TIME COMPUTING SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS, 1995. PROCEEDINGS., SECOND INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON TOKYO, JAPAN 25-27 OCT. 1995, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19951025), ISBN 0-8186-7106-8, pages 21 - 25, XP010196652 [X] 1,2,6,7,27-34,38-47 * page 23, column L, line 53 - column R, line 46 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RTCSA.1995.528746 |