EP1584336 - Method and device for gas odorisation and deodorisation with an alumina-based olfactory support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cool Sarl. ZI Quai Jean Jaurès 07800 La Voulte sur Rhône / FR | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berrebi, David ZI Quai Jean Jaurès 07800 La Voulte sur Rhône / FR | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/41] | Andreeff, François 4 rue de la Paroisse 78400 Chatou / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290559.6 | 02.03.2004 | [2005/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1584336 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584336 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/01, A61L9/04, A61L9/12 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
A61L9/12 (EP);
A61L9/01 (EP);
A61L9/013 (EP);
A61L9/046 (EP);
B01D53/02 (EP);
B01D53/0415 (EP);
B01J20/08 (EP);
B01J20/28092 (EP);
B01D2253/10 (EP);
B01D2253/104 (EP);
B01D2253/306 (EP);
B01D2253/31 (EP);
B01D2253/311 (EP);
B01D2257/90 (EP);
B01D2257/91 (EP);
B01D53/0454 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/25] |
Former [2005/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Odorierung und Desodorierung von Gasen mit Aluminiumoxid als Geruchsträger | [2005/41] | English: | Method and device for gas odorisation and deodorisation with an alumina-based olfactory support | [2005/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'odorisation et de désodorisation d'un gaz avec un support olfactif de type alumine | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 07.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 13.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2006 | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2007 | 31.03.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | BE | 31.03.2009 | [2010/10] |
Former [2009/40] | IT | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | NL | 13.08.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5752458 ; | [A]US5573984 (BREITENBUECHER KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, lines 14-61 ** column 3, lines 24-63; claim - *; | [X]US5637401 (BERMAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 8-10 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 60 * * column 5, lines 42-54 * * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 2; figure - *; | [X]FR2816521 (COOL SARL [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * the whole document *; | [XD]EP1285669 (COOL SARL [FR]) [XD] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 18, Database accession no. 1982-36331E, XP002246266 & JPS5752458 A 19820327 (DUSKIN FRANCHISE KK) [X] 1-3,6-10 * abstract * |